EDGE VILLAGE INSTITUTE

Charity number: 225610
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ANNIE NEW Trustee 12 May 2018 None on record
JOHN AIDAN LUKE Trustee None on record
Anne Buckland-Smith Trustee 12 January 2019 None on record
BRYAN TREVOR CORBIN Trustee 25 July 2013 None on record
ROGER BARRETT Trustee 10 July 2012 None on record
Kay Elizabeth Richardson Trustee 14 January 2017 None on record
MALCOLM HOLLINGSWORTH Trustee 10 July 2012 None on record
ROGER BRIAN STEWART Trustee 27 March 2014
THE VERNON SMITH CHURCH TRUST CHARITY Received: On time
Martin John Freeman Trustee 27 March 2014 None on record