ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS MACCLESFIELD, SOUTH EAST CHESHIRE AND BUXTON BRANCH

Charity number: 225689
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £64.30k £141.94k £55.04k £61.94k £57.38k
Total expenditure £63.29k £62.68k £63.74k £89.88k £70.96k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A