ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS MACCLESFIELD, SOUTH EAST CHESHIRE AND BUXTON BRANCH

Charity number: 225689
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Mark Terence Pepper Trustee 17 May 2018 None on record
Rachel Eileen White Trustee 16 June 2016 None on record
Christine Clements Trustee 20 June 2013 None on record
Michael Raymond North Trustee 19 April 2018
SILK CAT RESCUE Received: On time
Brenda Scott Trustee 19 June 2014 None on record
DAVID IAN GORTON Chair 09 August 2013
THE CONGLETON COMMUNITY TRUST Received: On time
VICKI Ainsworth Trustee 11 August 2013 None on record
CARMEN JANE COLE Trustee None on record
SUE PARSONS Trustee None on record