THRALE ALMSHOUSE AND RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY

Charity number: 225709
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

1. Provision and maintenance of residential accommodation at Thrale Almshouses, 27 Polworth Road, London SW16 and provision of benefits for residents. 2. Provision of relief for persons resident in the Ancient Parish of Streatham who are in conditions of need, hardship or distress ("Relief in Need").

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2021

Total income: £186,758
Total expenditure: £131,084

Fundraising

This charity does not raise funds from the public

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Accommodation/housing
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Lambeth

Governance

Registration history:
  • 08 October 1963: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • NON-ECCLESIASTICAL CHARITIES (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Homes England
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

1 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
THRALE ALMSHOUSE AND RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY TRUSTEE LIMITED Trustee 28 May 2012
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £152.95k £163.00k £164.19k £163.27k £186.76k
Total expenditure £91.05k £105.22k £106.47k £105.07k £131.08k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 21 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 21 January 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 05 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 05 January 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 29 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 29 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 24 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 24 January 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2017 19 February 2018 19 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 01 December 2017 On time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Alwyns Llp
Crown House
151 High Road
LOUGHTON
Essex
IG10 4LG
Phone:
020 8502 0411
Email:
No information available