CHARITY OF THOMAS ANNOTSON

Charity number: 225787
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020
Total gross income £3.90k £3.69k £3.69k £3.76k £4.14k
Total expenditure £1.49k £1.97k £2.44k £3.14k £2.14k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A