CHARITY OF THOMAS ANNOTSON

Charity number: 225787
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Joanna Louise Bewley Trustee 07 November 2019 None on record
RICHARD Edward HARTE Trustee 02 November 2010 None on record
REVD Canon CHRISTOPHER IAN COATES Chair 07 November 2002
DAME MARY LINDSAY Received: On time
THE CHURCH ESTATE,BISHOPTHORPE Received: On time
MALCOLM BRICKLEBANK Trustee 04 November 2008 None on record
David Stephen Wilson Trustee 03 November 2015 None on record
JOHN MERCHANT Trustee 02 November 2010 None on record
Martin Neil Waller Trustee 04 November 2016 None on record