EGREMONT SOUP KITCHEN FUND

Charity number: 225886
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 January 2020 09 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2020 Not Required
Annual return 01 January 2019 09 March 2020 129 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2019 Not Required
Annual return 01 January 2018 21 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2018 Not Required
Annual return 01 January 2017 15 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2017 Not Required
Annual return 01 January 2016 22 January 2017 82 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2016 Not Required