BRITISH HEART FOUNDATION

Charity number: 225971
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 13 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 13 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 23 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 23 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 26 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 26 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 02 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 02 November 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 23 September 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 23 September 2016 On time Download