ACRET ANNUITY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 14 March 1963: Standard registration
- 20 August 2004: Removed (Funds transferred (s.74))
- 20 August 2004: Funds transferred to 307892 THE ROYAL SOCIETY FOR BLIND CHILDREN
- "ACRET" ANNUITY (Previous name)
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2004 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2004 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
WILL DATED 28 SEPTEMBER 1920 AND SCHEME OF 22 OCTOBER 1926 AS AMENDED ON 29 APRIL 2004 BY A RESOLUTION PASSED UNDER THE PROVISIONS OF SECTION 74 OF THE CHARITIES ACT 1993.
Charitable objects
INCOME TO BE APPLIED IN PAYMENT OF AN ANNUITY OR ANNUITIES FOR SUCH OLD BLIND PERSON OR PESONS AS THE COMMITTEE MAY SELECT.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window