ALUM ROCK HALL TRUST

Charity number: 226084
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £7.34k £6.97k £3.51k £3.24k £6.62k
Total expenditure £5.52k £5.09k £5.31k £5.76k £5.74k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A