RESPIRATORY DISEASES AFTER-CARE COMMITTEE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
MAKE GRANTS TO INDIVIDUALS AND ORGANISATIONS FOR THE PURPOSE OF CARING FOR PATIENTS WITH RESPIRATORY DISEASES
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Kingston Upon Hull City
Governance
- 02 October 1963: Standard registration
- 26 April 2019: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 26 April 2019: Funds transferred to 509551 DOVE HOUSE HOSPICE LIMITED
- THE HULL AFTER CARE COLONY (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.98k | £1.63k | £510 | £1.33k | £136 | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.95k | £11.31k | £7.62k | £913 | £807 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2017 | 14 July 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2016 | 01 February 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2015 | 22 March 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2014 | 30 March 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2014 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION DATED 3/5/1918.
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE TREATMENT FOR PERSONS WHO SUFFER OR HAVE SUFFERED FROM TUBEROULOSIS AN TO PROVIDE OR OBTAIN EMPLOYMENT AND HOUSES FOR SUCH PERSONS AND THEIR FAMILIES AND DEPENDANTS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window