ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS BARNSLEY AND DISTRICT BRANCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Assisting RSPCA inspectors and animal collection officers on their aims of preventing cruelty to animals. Operating an animal rehoming programme, neutering, micro-chipping, vaccination services, providing cat pen and kennel provision, fostering and lost and found services, providing financial assistance for veterinary fees for those in need.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
22 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Barnsley
Governance
- 25 September 1963: Standard registration
- RSPCA BARNSLEY AND DISTRICT BRANCH (Working name)
- RSPCA BARNSLEY & DISTRICT BRANCH (Previous name)
- RSPCA YORKSHIRE - BARNSLEY AND DISTRICT BRANCH (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GARRY KIRK | Chair | 01 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
Pat Jobling | Trustee | 01 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Izzie Kirk | Trustee | 01 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
JENNIFER ROBERTSON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £207.38k | £177.46k | £177.46k | £172.41k | £199.86k | |
|
Total expenditure | £202.01k | £137.31k | £137.31k | £137.31k | £166.11k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £48.52k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 15 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 15 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 18 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 18 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 15 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 15 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 11 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 11 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 16 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 16 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RSPCA BRANCH RULES EFFECTIVE 18 FEBRUARY 2009
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE BRANCH ARE TO PROMOTE THE WORK AND OBJECTS OF THE SOCIETY [ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS (219099)], WITH PARTICULAR REFERENCE TO THE AREA OF THE BRANCH, IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE POLICIES OF THE SOCIETY.
Area of benefit
BARNSLEY AND DISTRICT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
RSPCA Barnsley & District
45 High Street
Wombwell
BARNSLEY
South Yorkshire
S73 8HB
- Phone:
- 07870989164
- Website:
-
rspca-barnsley.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window