UNITED CHARITIES FETCHAM

Charity number: 226276
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £40.76k £41.55k £44.83k £53.72k £53.59k
Total expenditure £54.36k £33.94k £59.48k £41.40k £45.06k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A