UNITED CHARITIES FETCHAM

Charity number: 226276
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Linked charities
Governing document
SCHEME OF 31 DECEMBER 1918 AS VARIED BY SCHEMES OF 16 DECEMBER 1927, 24 APRIL 1936, 13 JANUARY 1939 AND 26 MAY 1959.
Charitable objects
READING ROOM OR LIBRARY FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE ANCIENT PARISH OF FETCHAM.
Area of benefit
ANCIENT PARISH OF FETCHAM
Registration history
  • 23 March 1963 : Standard registration