UNITED CHARITIES FETCHAM

Charity number: 226276
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Howard Taylor Trustee 13 March 2020 None on record
Tracy Keeley Trustee 13 July 2018 None on record
TIM HALL Trustee None on record
Lynne Brooks Trustee 14 July 2017 None on record
NIGEL TURNER Trustee 10 October 2013 None on record
Paul Kennedy Trustee 14 July 2017 None on record
Stephen John Arthur Trustee 10 January 2020 None on record
Jane Arthur Trustee 10 January 2020 None on record
DAVID DUFFILL Chair 11 October 2013 None on record
James Dorey Trustee 11 September 2015 None on record
JOHN EDWIN BOURNE Trustee None on record