THE CHARITY OF CHRISTOPHER KELD

Charity number: 226404
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 15 October 2020 08 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 15 October 2020 Not Required
Annual return 15 October 2019 07 January 2021 145 days late
Accounts and TAR 15 October 2019 Not Required
Annual return 15 October 2018 07 January 2021 511 days late
Accounts and TAR 15 October 2018 Not Required
Annual return 15 October 2017 23 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 15 October 2017 Not Required
Annual return 15 October 2016 25 July 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 15 October 2016 Not Required