THE CHARITY OF CHRISTOPHER KELD

Charity number: 226404
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 15/10/2016 15/10/2017 15/10/2018 15/10/2019 15/10/2020
Total gross income £155 £152 £153 £157 £156
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £125
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A