Accounts and annual returns JAMES RILEY

Charity number: 226442
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 Overdue Overdue by 328 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Overdue Overdue by 328 days
Annual return 31 August 2019 Overdue Overdue by 693 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Overdue Overdue by 693 days
Annual return 31 August 2018 29 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 26 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2016 10 February 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 Not Required