SEAFARERS UK (KING GEORGE'S FUND FOR SAILORS)

Charity number: 226446
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 06 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 06 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 21 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 21 August 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 11 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 11 September 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 23 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 23 October 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 11 November 2016 11 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 26 October 2016 On time Download