SEAFARERS UK (KING GEORGE'S FUND FOR SAILORS)

Charity number: 226446
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

14 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Nusrat Ghani Trustee 08 December 2020 None on record
GERALD EDWARD KIDD Trustee 27 April 2017
HOLY ROOD TRUST Received: On time
PROPERTY HELD IN CONNECTION WITH THE BENEDICTINE CONGREGATION OF ST MARY OF MONTE OLIVETO CIO Recently registered
SYLVIA WADDILOVE FOUNDATION UK Received: 6 days late
William Andrew REID Trustee 22 May 2018
THE ROYAL STAR & GARTER HOMES Received: On time
Robert John Greenwood Trustee 27 April 2017 None on record
William Ernest Lawes Trustee 08 September 2016 None on record
DUNCAN BAIN Trustee 19 May 2015 None on record
NATALIE SHAW Trustee 28 April 2016 None on record
Mark Carden Trustee 12 September 2012
SEAFARERS HOSPITAL SOCIETY Received: On time
THE MARITIME EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION Received: On time
THE NATIONAL SEA TRAINING TRUST Received: On time
JEREMY MONROE Trustee 17 June 2013 None on record
MARK DICKINSON Trustee 10 September 2012
THE JOHN WILLIAM SLATER MEMORIAL FUND Received: On time
Paul Gerard Butterworth Chair 09 July 2020 None on record
Rear Admiral Iain Stuart Lower Trustee 08 December 2020 None on record
Peter French Trustee 22 May 2018 None on record
SURGEON COMMODORE PETER J BUXTON OBE QHP RN Trustee 12 September 2012 None on record