CHURCH OF ENGLAND SOLDIERS', SAILORS' & AIRMEN'S CLUBS

Charity number: 226684
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £1.78m £1.76m £1.64m £1.39m £806.02k
Total expenditure £1.83m £1.81m £1.71m £1.54m £980.02k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £55.51k
Income - Donations and legacies £3.77k £3.06k £2.15k £5.69k £198
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £1.58m £1.55m £1.44m £1.19m £558.33k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £107.61k £115.32k £110.74k £110.89k £99.53k
Income - Other £94.53k £85.43k £86.71k £88.07k £92.45k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.83m £1.80m £1.70m £1.53m £973.86k
Expenditure - Raising funds £4.44k £4.72k £4.61k £4.60k £6.16k
Expenditure - Governance £29.62k £25.49k £28.83k £32.16k £29.03k
Expenditure - Grants institution £4.49k £4.88k £4.00k £3.58k £55
Expenditure - Investment management £4.44k £4.72k £4.61k £4.60k £6.16k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0