Trustees THE GENERAL SERVICE BOARD OF ALCOHOLICS ANONYMOUS (GREAT BRITAIN) LIMITED

Charity number: 226745
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

19 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Levente Gabor Patocs Trustee 10 April 2022
None on record
Dr Kieran John Moriarty Trustee 10 April 2022
None on record
Malcolm Hamish McSwan Trustee 10 April 2022
None on record
Andrina Cassidy Trustee 10 April 2022
None on record
Zelma Irene Kesans Trustee 10 April 2022
None on record
John Patrick Coady Trustee 10 April 2022
None on record
Tim John Barker Trustee 10 April 2022
None on record
Charon Bourke Trustee 10 April 2022
None on record
Joanna Faul Trustee 18 April 2021
None on record
Gretchen Swisher Trustee 18 April 2021
None on record
Justin Bernard Tunstall Trustee 18 April 2020
None on record
Barbara Jean Owen Trustee 18 April 2020
None on record
Charles Roberts Trustee 18 April 2020
None on record
Thomas Kelly Fox Trustee 18 April 2020
None on record
Professor Thomas Raymond Baldwin Trustee 14 April 2019
None on record
Stephen Smith Trustee 15 April 2018
None on record
Clive Paul Kilmartin Trustee 15 April 2018
None on record
Dr Mani Mehdikhani Trustee 23 April 2017
None on record
Amanda Jane Stocks Trustee 23 April 2017
None on record