Financial history PROVINCIAL GRAND LODGE OF NOTTINGHAMSHIRE CHARITY COMMITTEE

Charity number: 226943
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £112.74k £87.23k £79.67k £75.05k £53.88k
Total expenditure £129.81k £110.39k £102.41k £55.24k £68.61k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A