Trustees HARTHILL TEA DAY SOCIAL CLUB
Charity number: 226997
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Marlene Lockwood | Chair | 15 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Bateman | Trustee | 04 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susan Anne Klinker | Trustee | 05 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Marie Watson | Trustee | 10 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Pat Downs | Trustee | 15 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Valerie Panter | Trustee | 10 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Angela Murray | Trustee | 10 October 2018 |
|
|||||
Marlene Popple | Trustee | 19 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
Susan Mason | Trustee | 01 April 2009 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.