THE DONCASTER COUNCIL FOR VOLUNTARY SERVICE
Charity number: 226998
Removed charity
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
What the charity does:
No information available
Who the charity helps:
No information available
How the charity helps:
No information available
Governance
Registration history:
- 06 November 1963: Standard registration
- 11 June 1993: Removed
Organisation type:
Other names:
- DONCASTER AND DISTRICT COUNCIL OF SOCIAL SERVICE (Previous name)
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available
Financial history
No financial information provided for the past 5 financial periods
Accounts and annual returns
No accounts and annual returns information is available for this removed charity
Governing document
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AND RULES AMENDED 15 NOVEMBER 1978, 26 JULY 1979 AND 10 JULY 1991.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY IN THE METROPOLITAN BOROUGH OF DONCASTER AND IN PARTICULAR THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, THE PROTECTION OF HEALTH AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, DISTRESS AND SICKNESS.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
MERTROPOLITAN BOROUGH OF DONCASTER
Linked charities
Linked charities
Governing document
UNKNOWN
Charitable objects
ADVICE AND INFORMATION TO GENERAL PUBLIC
Area of benefit
DONCASTER AND DISTRICT
Registration history
- 06 November 1963 : Standard registration
- 11 June 1993 : Removed
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.