Financial history THE ESSEX COUNTY FOOTBALL ASSOCIATION BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity number: 227116
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £3.11k £1.88k £5.76k £4.96k £5.47k
Total expenditure £4.56k £5.20k £2.80k £11.10k £6.85k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A