Accounts and annual returns JABEZ AND SELAH BENNETT CHARITY

Charity number: 227141
Charity reporting is overdue by 74 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 74 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 74 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 17 January 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 11 January 2023 345 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 11 January 2023 710 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 11 January 2023 1076 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required