THE EDMUND GODSON CHARITY

Charity number: 227463
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2020 18 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2019 27 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 01 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 26 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2016 12 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2016 Not Required