HANNAH MARY HARRISON'S CHARITY

Charity number: 227630
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2021 25 August 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2020 30 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2019 30 November 2020 366 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2018 19 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2017 26 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2017 Not Required