CHABAD LUBAVITCH UK

Charity number: 227638
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £8.70m £8.51m £6.79m £5.22m £5.33m
Total expenditure £10.08m £9.17m £7.56m £5.48m £5.41m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A £1.24m £657.61k
Income from government grants £4.13m £4.73m £1.34m £1.24m £353.92k
Income - Donations and legacies £3.37m £2.76m £5.28m £2.51m £2.83m
Income - Other trading activities £44.68k £91.59k £383.62k £245.71k £58.89k
Income - Charitable activities £5.28m £5.67m £1.12m £2.45m £2.14m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £18.51k £10.01k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £298.04k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £58.01k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £9.51m £8.69m £7.30m £5.33m £5.31m
Expenditure - Raising funds £574.89k £484.53k £258.55k £151.92k £102.94k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £44.80k £20.00k £57.13k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0