BROADWAY UNITED CHARITIES

Charity Number: 227676
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Providing subsidised housing. Assisting underprivileged. Helping educational needs.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £12,887
Total expenditure: £11,913

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Accommodation/housing
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Worcestershire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 19 November 1963: Standard registration
  • 23 September 1996: Removed
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Ruth Elizabeth Davenport BA Trustee 26 April 2023
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MICHAEL AND ALL ANGELS, BROADWAY,WORCESTER
Received: On time
Dr Joan Margaret Reading Trustee 05 April 2022
None on record
Nigel David Alan Robinson Trustee 20 July 2021
None on record
Rev MICHELLE WARD Trustee 25 June 2013
None on record
SIMON JOHN PYM WILLIAMSON CFP Trustee
None on record
KEVIN BEASLEY Trustee
THE CHURCH LAND AND CLARKE'S PIECE
Received: On time
THE FOUNDATION OF THOMAS HODGES
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MICHAEL AND ALL ANGELS, BROADWAY,WORCESTER
Received: On time
THE BROADWAY YOUTH TRUST
Received: On time
Philip Clifford Whatmough Trustee
FRIENDS OF ST EADBURGHA'S
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £10.54k £11.51k £10.98k £10.99k £12.89k
Total expenditure £11.65k £15.12k £7.02k £18.02k £11.91k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 07 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 19 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 26 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 21 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 29 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
SCHEME OF 1 NOVEMBER 1965
Charitable objects
GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE POOR
Area of benefit
FORMER ANCIENT PARISH OF BROADWAY
Registration history
  • 19 November 1963 : Standard registration
  • 23 September 1996 : Removed

Contact information

Address:
59 Morris Road
Broadway
WR12 7RD
Phone:
07741 456700
Website:

No information available