THE NORTH OF ENGLAND NEUROLOGICAL ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We organise an annual scientific meeting for neuroscientists/physicians/surgeons in the North of England, sponsoring junior doctors, and offering travel grants.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 25 February 1964: Standard registration
- N E N A (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Richard James Booth ELLIS | Trustee | 09 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Pietro D'Urso | Trustee | 26 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Rajiv Mohanraj | Trustee | 23 November 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.20k | £3.59k | £2.85k | £12.04k | £20.15k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.13k | £81 | £0 | £12.81k | £20.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 25 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 10 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 14 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 17 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 19 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES FOUNDED IN 1962
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE ADVANCE OF THE NEUROLOGICAL SCIENCES IN THE NORTH OF ENGLAND
Area of benefit
THE NORTH OF ENGLAND
Contact information
- Address:
-
Salford Royal Nhs Foundation Trust
Stott Lane
SALFORD
Neurology and Neurosurgery
M6 8HD
- Phone:
- 07956148189
- Email:
- pietro.durso@srft.nhs.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window