EDINBURGH TRUST NO2 ACCOUNT

Charity number: 227897
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2021 24 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 24 November 2021 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2020 17 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 17 December 2020 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2019 27 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 27 November 2019 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2018 01 February 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 01 February 2019 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2017 09 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

09 November 2017 On time Download