Accounts and annual returns THE WHITECHAPEL MISSION

Charity number: 227905
Charity reporting is overdue by 187 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2022 Overdue Overdue by 187 days
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2022 Overdue Overdue by 187 days
Annual return 31 October 2021 29 August 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2021 29 August 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2020 26 August 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 26 August 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2019 07 November 2020 68 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 07 November 2020 68 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2018 10 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2018 10 August 2019 On time Download Open in new window