THE WHITECHAPEL MISSION

Charity number: 227905
Charity reporting is up to date (68 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr Keith Aldred PHD, CPFA Trustee
LOUGHTON METHODIST CHURCH Received: On time
METHODIST CHURCH IN TOWER HAMLETS Received: On time
Stephen PERRY Trustee 30 August 2011
LOUGHTON METHODIST CHURCH Received: On time
Cheryl Gurnham Trustee 11 January 2018
METHODIST CHURCH IN TOWER HAMLETS Received: On time
WESLEY'S CHAPEL AND LEYSIAN MISSION Received: On time
PETER JACKSON BUTT BSC MBCS Trustee
BARKING DAGENHAM & ILFORD METHODIST CIRCUIT Received: On time
Rev Jennifer Hunter Smith Trustee 13 June 2019
WESLEY'S CHAPEL AND LEYSIAN MISSION Received: On time
Paul Hornsby Trustee 31 August 2011 None on record
Michael Spurr Chair 11 January 2018
THE BUTLER TRUST Received: On time
PRISON RADIO ASSOCIATION Received: On time
Peter Barlow Trustee 11 January 2018 None on record
REV John Hayes Trustee 01 January 2016
METHODIST CHURCH IN TOWER HAMLETS Received: On time
POPLAR METHODIST CHURCH SICK & POOR FUND Received: On time
BOW ROAD METHODIST CHURCH Received: On time
Joanna Fozzard Trustee 12 October 2017 None on record