Financial history THE ROYAL INSTITUTION OF GREAT BRITAIN

Charity number: 227938
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021
Total gross income £4.09m £4.25m £5.25m £4.21m £3.20m
Total expenditure £4.47m £4.57m £5.33m £4.83m £3.97m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £496.00k £678.57k
Income - Donations and legacies £179.00k £162.00k £527.00k £870.00k £321.17k
Income - Other trading activities £2.27m £2.20m £2.67m £1.79m £1.20m
Income - Charitable activities £1.51m £1.74m £1.91m £1.41m £817.89k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £129.00k £148.00k £152.00k £144.00k £179.37k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £678.57k
Income - Legacies £11.00k £1.00k £30.00k £27.00k £102.28k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £3.01m £3.18m £3.59m £3.34m £2.93m
Expenditure - Raising funds £1.46m £1.40m £1.73m £1.49m £1.04m
Expenditure - Governance £392.00k £159.00k £260.00k £256.00k £147.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £55.00k £56.00k £51.00k £51.00k £37.00k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0