ALMSHOUSE AND PENSION CHARITY OF JULIA NORRIS
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
ACCOMMODATION SUPPLIED TO CONFORM WITH THE PROVISIONS OF THE SCHEME OF THIS CHARITY.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2015
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Cambridgeshire
Governance
- 03 October 1963: Standard registration
- 21 November 2016: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 21 November 2016: Funds transferred to 1165904 THE JULIA NORRIS TRUST
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2011 | 31/12/2012 | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.32k | £12.49k | £13.35k | £15.72k | £19.28k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.27k | £4.31k | £23.50k | £22.39k | £18.83k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2015 | 12 May 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2014 | 21 April 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2014 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2013 | 02 May 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2013 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2012 | 28 April 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2012 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 2 JUNE 1983 AND ORDER DATED 23 NOVEMBER 2006 AMENDED ON 11 DECEMBER 2006
Charitable objects
PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF OUR ALMSHOUSES FOR POOR PERSONS OF GOOD CHARACTER, IN COMMUNION WITH THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND AND WHO HAVE NOT FOR THREE YEARS PRECEEDING THE TIME OF THEIR APPOINTMENT BEEN IN RECEIPT OF PAROCHIAL RELIEF, AND WHO FROM AGE, ILL-HEALTH, ACCIDENT OR INFIRMITY, ARE WHOLLY, OR IN PART UNABLE TO MAINTAIN THEMSELVES BY THEIR OWN EXERTIONS (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE SCHEME)
Area of benefit
LITTLE GRANSDEN AND DISTRICT
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window