Financial history SOLDEN HILL HOUSE LIMITED

Charity number: 228037
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £1.43m £1.40m £1.57m £1.57m £1.74m
Total expenditure £2.36m £1.32m £1.67m £1.43m £1.61m
Income from government contracts £1.25m £1.37m £1.30m £1.49m £1.64m
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £80.06k
Income - Donations and legacies £15.88k £21.29k £23.68k £28.38k £103.65k
Income - Other trading activities £1.41m £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £1.37m £1.53m £1.54m £1.64m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £5.62k £5.31k £11.31k £7.01k £1.15k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.16m £1.29m £1.67m £1.43m £1.61m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 £5.42k £0 £5.36k £5.04k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £1.20m £36.65k £0 £0 £0