Trustees MUSICIANS BENEVOLENT FUND
Charity number: 228089

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
18 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Isabel Garvey | Trustee | 27 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Samuel Donald Jackson | Trustee | 28 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
James Lewis Benner | Trustee | 28 April 2022 |
|
|||||
Silvia Merrylees Montello | Trustee | 23 June 2021 |
|
|||||
Robert Duncan James Shennan | Trustee | 23 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Christopher Neil Swift | Trustee | 23 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Clifford Fluet | Trustee | 23 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Peter Higgins | Trustee | 08 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Edward Kershaw | Trustee | 18 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Anne Mitchener | Trustee | 18 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Charisse Beaumont | Trustee | 27 September 2018 |
|
|||||
Melanie Grundy | Trustee | 27 September 2018 |
|
|||||
Jason Carter | Trustee | 07 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Richard Jeremy Wigley | Trustee | 26 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Daltrey | Trustee | 26 April 2018 |
|
|||||
ALEX SPOFFORTH BA FCA | Trustee | 26 April 2018 |
|
|||||
SANDEEP DWESAR | Trustee | 28 May 2015 |
|
|||||
KATHRYN LANGRIDGE | Trustee | 08 July 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.