BEARSTED AND THURNHAM WOMEN'S INSTITUTE

Charity number: 228182
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 15/03/2017 15/03/2018 15/03/2019 15/03/2020 15/03/2021
Total gross income £32.19k £28.39k £33.55k £30.17k £30.16k
Total expenditure £26.65k £26.87k £28.52k £33.96k £33.96k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.00k £0 N/A N/A £20.19k