WOMEN'S INSTITUTE - COPMANTHORPE

Charity number: 228283
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/08/2017 30/08/2018 30/08/2019 30/08/2020 30/08/2021
Total gross income £8.12k £14.45k £9.54k £16.72k £24.53k
Total expenditure £40.38k £12.68k £8.91k £5.37k £30.17k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £10.00k £18.77k