WOMEN'S INSTITUTE - COPMANTHORPE

Charity number: 228283
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
RACHAEL BLACK Chair 01 October 2016
COMBATING OBESITY LTD Received: On time
ELISABETH WYATT Trustee 17 March 2013 None on record
Wendy Wallace Trustee 01 October 2019 None on record
VICKI DOUGALL Trustee 17 March 2013 None on record
Mary Bardet Trustee 02 October 2013 None on record
Diana Johnson Trustee 02 October 2014 None on record