Accounts and annual returns WOMEN'S INSTITUTE - MIDDLETON-ST-GEORGE

Charity number: 228315
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2021 29 May 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2020 21 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 04 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2018 04 January 2020 158 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2017 02 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 Not Required