THE SOUTH TYNESIDE BLIND WELFARE ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 228573
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 06 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 10 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 30 June 2019 150 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 20 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 06 February 2017 6 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required