Financial history THE PIRBRIGHT INSTITUTE

Charity number: 228824
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £34.49m £46.45m £47.85m £60.08m £80.68m
Total expenditure £41.14m £46.25m £46.19m £45.58m £48.00m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A £70.72m
Income from government grants £27.09m £38.23m £37.62m £48.89m £7.07m
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £15.35m £15.45m £15.45m £18.93m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £1.80m £0 £2.61m
Income - Charitable activities £31.79m £28.87m £29.62m £41.53m £58.19m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.09m £819.00k £975.00k £1.05m £956.00k
Income - Other £1.62m £1.41m £0 £2.05m £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £40.48m £45.56m £46.18m £45.56m £47.98m
Expenditure - Raising funds £659.00k £688.00k £16.00k £20.00k £18.00k
Expenditure - Governance £148.00k £61.00k £78.00k £38.00k £90.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £12.00k £15.00k £16.00k £20.00k £18.00k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0