Financial history PETER LATHOM (INCLUDING THE LATHOM EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION)

Charity number: 228828
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £57.96k £59.44k £56.92k £53.64k £55.73k
Total expenditure £51.38k £54.14k £54.24k £57.26k £64.42k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A