Trustees PETER LATHOM (INCLUDING THE LATHOM EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION)

Charity number: 228828
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

44 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
CHRISTOPHER JOHN BYRON Chair
None on record
Susan Brake Trustee 12 September 2022
None on record
Grahame Green Trustee 15 May 2022
RICHARD DURNING'S SCHOOL CHARITY
Received: On time
Angela Draper Trustee 19 February 2022
None on record
Janine Clayton Trustee 01 December 2021
None on record
JANET MARY CAUNCE Trustee 18 November 2021
SOUTHPORT AND ORMSKIRK BANTAM SOCIETY
Received: On time
GILL STUBBS Trustee 13 October 2021
None on record
FRANK JOHNSON Trustee 17 May 2021
WRIGHTINGTON WELFARE PENSIONERS ASSOCIATION MOSSY LEA SECTION
Received: On time
DERICK MOSS Trustee 28 October 2020
None on record
ALICE COREN Trustee 19 February 2020
TAMESIDE, OLDHAM AND GLOSSOP MIND
Received: On time
DIANE BONNEY Trustee 03 February 2020
None on record
Susan Gregson Trustee 16 December 2019
None on record
ROBINA CRITCHLEY Trustee 17 April 2019
None on record
PAUL ADRIAN BLAIR WILCOX Trustee 11 February 2019
None on record
SUSAN LAMB Trustee 19 November 2018
None on record
BRIAN BAILEY Trustee 15 November 2018
None on record
HUGH JAMES SLOAN Trustee 24 October 2018
CHARITY OF REVEREND CHARLES LAYFIELD DD
Received: On time
ACTION FOR ULNES WALTON
Received: On time
ADAM YATES Trustee 02 October 2018
None on record
SARAH CARRUTHERS Trustee 04 July 2018
None on record
JULIA PEGGS Trustee 31 January 2018
None on record
GILLIAN ELIZABETH RAINFORD Trustee 25 August 2017
None on record
JOHN MERCER Trustee 27 October 2016
None on record
HARDISTY DAVID Trustee 20 July 2016
None on record
KAY BEATTY Trustee 18 July 2016
None on record
ALLISON JAYNE CROFT Trustee 04 December 2015
None on record
MICHELE SKINLEY Trustee 04 December 2015
None on record
PAMELA SLOAN Trustee 16 November 2015
ACTION FOR ULNES WALTON
Received: On time
KATHLEEN ALMOND Trustee 31 October 2015
CROSTON UNITED CHARITIES
Received: On time
FRIENDS OF THE RIVER YARROW
Received: On time
PAUL COTTERILL Trustee 25 October 2015
None on record
KATHLEEN VIVIEN CUMMINGS Trustee 28 October 2014
None on record
EDWARD GERRARD POPE Trustee 27 October 2014
None on record
CLLR. MAY BLAKE Trustee 27 June 2014
RICHARD DURNING'S SCHOOL CHARITY
Received: On time
LISA MOLYNEUX Trustee 22 March 2013
None on record
MICHAEL MILLER Trustee 12 October 2012
None on record
JANE MARSHALL Trustee 12 October 2012
ORMSKIRK SCHOOL TRUST
Received: On time
ALAN WHITTAKER Trustee 12 October 2012
FRIENDS OF THE RIVER YARROW
Received: On time
EILEEN MARY DORAN Trustee
None on record
JIM HILL Trustee
None on record
JOHN DAVID SNAPE Trustee
None on record
IAN ROY TINSLEY Trustee
None on record
SHEILA EDGECOMBE BRAITHWAITE Trustee
None on record
WILLIAM JOSEPH CROPPER Trustee
None on record
MR A OWENS Trustee
ORMSKIRK SCHOOL TRUST
Received: On time
HILARY ROSBOTHAM Trustee
None on record