CUMBRIA - CUMBERLAND FEDERATION OF WOMEN'S INSTITUTES

Charity number: 228857
Charity reporting is up to date (159 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 08 April 2021 159 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 08 April 2021 159 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 29 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 29 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 18 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 12 December 2018 42 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 08 February 2018 100 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 08 February 2018 100 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 19 October 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 20 October 2016 On time Download