CUMBRIA - CUMBERLAND FEDERATION OF WOMEN'S INSTITUTES

Charity number: 228857
Charity reporting is up to date (159 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £110.69k £96.55k £84.61k £55.08k £88.76k
Total expenditure £119.95k £97.63k £89.48k £67.10k £87.22k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A