CUMBRIA - CUMBERLAND FEDERATION OF WOMEN'S INSTITUTES

Charity number: 228857
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Trustees organise events which are publicised to the membership for their benefit and to generate funds towards the running of the Federation.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £50,062
Total expenditure: £72,552

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Cumbria

Governance

Registration history:
  • 27 September 1963: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • WOMEN'S INSTITUTES CUMBERLAND FEDERATION (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Investment
  • Risk management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Kathleen Bowron Chair 14 June 2016
NORTH CUMBRIA METHODIST CIRCUIT
Received: On time
BEAUMONT PARISH HALL
Received: On time
Mandy Henderson Trustee 19 October 2023
None on record
Glynis Aspin Trustee 14 February 2023
None on record
Susan Addyman Trustee 14 June 2022
None on record
Dawn Eyre Trustee 28 March 2020
None on record
Ann Kirkpatrick Trustee 28 March 2020
None on record
Penny Coulthard Trustee 08 January 2019
None on record
Jennifer Baker Trustee 11 April 2017
None on record
Kris Longshaw Trustee 11 April 2017
None on record
SANDRA CLIFFORD Trustee 15 April 2016
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £88.76k £34.49k £38.73k £42.30k £50.06k
Total expenditure £87.22k £49.13k £47.82k £48.31k £72.55k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 26 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 26 November 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 31 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 31 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 30 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 30 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 01 February 2022 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 01 February 2022 1 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 08 April 2021 159 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 08 April 2021 159 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
UNKNOWN
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE BURSARIES FOR SENDING W.I. MEMBERS TO DENMAN COLLEGE COURSES.
Area of benefit
CUMBRIA
Registration history
  • 27 September 1963 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
WI Office
Unit 12A
Clifford Court
Cooper Way
Parkhouse
CARLISLE
Phone:
01228521774